Senate | 02/02/2023 | Assigned Pa 0002'23 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/01/2023 01:44 Pm | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Approved By Governor 02/01/2023 12:54 Pm | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Presented To Governor 02/01/2023 12:22 Pm | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Received On 01/26/2023 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 9 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |