Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill June 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 28, 2023