Senate | 07/18/2023 | Assigned Pa 0053'23 | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 09:58 Am | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:26 Pm | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 01:48 Pm | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Immediate Effect Defeated | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Received On 03/09/2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 51 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin |