Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 14, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023