Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0191'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:28 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/07/2023 01:20 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Presented To Governor 10/27/2023 02:20 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 548 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 Yeas 86 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Received On 03/15/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 77 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Amendment(s) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Amendment(s) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang
|
|
|