Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0068 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 21, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 17, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023