Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0062'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:16 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:44 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:02 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 386 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received On 05/04/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 153 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Roger Hauck
|
|
|