Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0080 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 13, 2023