Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0220'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:42 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/22/2023 11:36 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:38 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Immediate Effect Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 706 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 496 Yeas 61 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Postponed For The Day
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Received On 06/08/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 338 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced By Senator John Cherry
|
|
|