Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill June 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill November 28, 2023