House | 05/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Received On 05/10/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 186 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |