Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0125'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 09/19/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Approved By Governor 09/18/2023 05:00 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Presented To Governor 09/13/2023 11:10 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 Yeas 82 Nays 25 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Received On 06/08/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 330 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel
|
|
|