Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0315'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:16 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 12/13/2023 05:08 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:48 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 739 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Substitute (h-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 Yeas 67 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (h-4) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Received On 06/28/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 425 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel
|
|
|