Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0150'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/19/2023 11:28 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Approved By Governor 10/19/2023 09:42 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Presented To Governor 10/10/2023 09:16 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 486 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 325 Yeas 103 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Received On 06/28/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 420 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana
|
|
|