House | 05/16/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Received On 05/11/2023 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 245 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Amendment(s) Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |