Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred To Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Conferees Named 06/06/2023: Reps. Will Snyder Jasper Martus Greg Vanwoerkom
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Conferees Named 05/23/2023: Sens. Mary Cavanagh Kristen Mcdonald Rivet Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 05/23/2023: Sens. Mary Cavanagh, Kristen Mcdonald Rivet, Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 309 Yeas 0 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Received On 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 262 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 261 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Mary Cavanagh
|
|
|