Senate | 12/19/2024 | Presented To Governor 12/19/2024 09:38 Am | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Roll Call: Roll Call # 572 Yeas 23 Nays 12 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | House Substitute (h-6) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 09/26/2024 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 Yeas 56 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 13 | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Substitute (h-6) Adopted And Amended | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Received On 05/09/2024 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 142 Yeas 24 Nays 11 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-11) As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Substitute (s-11) As Amended Concurred In | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-11) And Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-5) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-5) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |