Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0230'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/29/2023 01:08 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/28/2023 01:22 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:30 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 675 Yeas 22 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Received On 09/26/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 457 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet
|
|
|