Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0316'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:18 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 12/13/2023 05:10 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:14 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 659 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Returned From House With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 479 Yeas 84 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Returned As Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
House Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 Yeas 85 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Received On 06/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 406 Yeas 30 Nays 6 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sam Singh
|
|
|