House | 11/08/2023 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Roll Call Roll Call # 499 Yeas 54 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Adverse Roll Call | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Postponed Temporarily | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Received On 06/27/2023 | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 405 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet |