LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0303
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan Senate Bill SB0303
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan Senate Bill SB0303
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
April 27, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
June 27, 2023
Compare
Bill
May 24, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
July 17, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 13, 2024
Chaptered
Bill
August 1, 2023
Compare