Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0176'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/24/2023 11:44 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Approved By Governor 10/24/2023 10:12 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Presented To Governor 10/24/2023 09:17 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 78 Nays 32 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Received On 09/27/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 476 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel
|
|
|