Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0081'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:20 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Approved By Governor 07/18/2023 11:24 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:50 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 433 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Enrollment Vacated
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 431 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 239 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received On 06/14/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 361 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss
|
|
|