Senate | 06/29/2023 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 264 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 06/28/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Received On 06/22/2023 | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 369 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Introduced By Senator Edward Mcbroom |