House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Received On 06/20/2024 | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 256 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sam Singh |