House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Received On 11/02/2023 | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 650 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Introduced By Senator Rosemary Bayer |