House | 12/03/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Received On 09/17/2024 | ||
Senate | 09/17/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 336 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4) | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (s-4) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |