Senate | 06/20/2024 | Assigned Pa 0063'24 | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/20/2024 11:00 Am | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Approved By Governor 06/20/2024 10:04 Am | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Presented To Governor 06/11/2024 09:36 Am | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 86 Yeas 101 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Received On 01/25/2024 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 4 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt |