LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0416
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan Senate Bill SB0416
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan Senate Bill SB0416
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
June 27, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 14, 2024
Compare
Bill
January 25, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 11, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 1, 2024
Chaptered
Bill
June 20, 2024
Compare