Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0300'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2023 10:26 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 12/12/2023 10:48 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:24 Am | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 525 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Received On 10/12/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 524 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Introduced By Senator Paul Wojno |