Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0302'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2023 10:30 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 12/12/2023 10:52 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:28 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 527 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Received On 10/12/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 526 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin
|
|
|