Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0435 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill October 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill December 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2023