House | 12/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Received On 11/07/2024 | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 389 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sue Shink |