Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0239'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/29/2023 05:06 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/27/2023 02:38 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 740 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 576 Yeas 87 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Received On 10/05/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 503 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sue Shink
|
|
|