Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0317'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2023 10:20 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 12/13/2023 05:12 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:36 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 514 Yeas 103 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Received On 10/12/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 520 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Mallory Mcmorrow
|
|
|