Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill December 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2023