Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 12, 2023
Bill September 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 8, 2023