House | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Received On 10/20/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 565 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |