House | 12/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Received On 11/08/2023 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 692 Yeas 30 Nays 5 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |