Senate | 07/30/2024 | Assigned Pa 0106'24 | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:20 Pm | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Approved By Governor 07/23/2024 10:20 Am | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Presented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:48 Pm | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 202 Yeas 60 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Received On 11/09/2023 | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 719 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |