Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0231'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/29/2023 01:10 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/28/2023 01:24 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:32 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 676 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
House Substitute (h-6) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Substitute (h-6) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Received On 10/27/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 613 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-6) As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Substitute (s-6) As Amended Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-6) And Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sue Shink
|
|
|