Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0505 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill November 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 6, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 4, 2023