Senate | 11/08/2023 | Assigned Pa 0196'23 With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:38 Pm | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/07/2023 01:30 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Presented To Governor 10/27/2023 02:30 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Given Immediate Effect | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Received On 09/27/2023 | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 468 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 09/26/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 09/26/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |