Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 11, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 30, 2024