Senate | 12/19/2024 | Presented To Governor 12/19/2024 09:42 Am | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Roll Call: Roll Call # 574 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Received On 01/25/2024 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 2 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sue Shink |