Senate
|
12/19/2024
|
Presented To Governor 12/19/2024 09:44 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 575 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Received On 01/25/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 3 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang
|
|
|