Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0199'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/20/2023 04:45 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/20/2023 12:48 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/17/2023 09:47 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 638 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 Yeas 58 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Received On 10/11/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 518 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sue Shink
|
|
|