Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0240'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:12 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/29/2023 05:08 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 11/27/2023 02:32 Pm | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 516 Yeas 103 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Received On 10/20/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 579 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss |