House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Received On 06/25/2024 | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 272 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Introduced By Senator Paul Wojno |