Senate
|
10/15/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0146'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/10/2024 02:02 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2024
|
Approved By Governor 10/10/2024 11:54 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Presented To Governor 10/08/2024 09:10 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 360 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
House Substitute (h-5) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 100 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-5) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5)
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received On 03/12/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 53 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Substitute (s-3) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Jeff Irwin
|
|
|